MA S2266 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S1824
Note: Legislation replaced by S2505

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-10 - New draft substituted, see S2505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote electric vehicle adoption,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2266).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting electric vehicle adoption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-10SenateNew draft substituted, see S2505
2016-11-10SenateRead second
2016-11-10SenateRules suspended
2016-11-10SenateCommittee recommended out to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2505
2016-05-02SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2016-05-02SenateNew draft of S1824
2016-05-02SenateReported from the committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S1824 (Replaces) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2266
S2505 (Replaced by) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 448 of the Acts of 2016
S1323 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1308 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1759 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2274
S1363 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1828 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback