CA AB1896 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 875 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Secure youth treatment facilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Diane Dixon [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 2 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Reconsideration refused. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-01-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 875 | Amended Code | Citation Text |