US HB1157 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the authorization of appropriations for the Countering the People's Republic of China Malign Influence Fund, and for other purposes.
Title
Countering the PRC Malign Influence Fund Authorization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Roll Calls
2024-09-09 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass RC# 401 (Y: 351 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 43) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2024-09-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-09-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 351 - 36 (Roll no. 401). (text: CR H5066-5067) |
2024-09-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5080-5081) |
2024-09-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2024-09-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1157. |
2024-09-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5066-5068) |
2024-09-09 | House | Mr. Barr moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2023-02-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |