CA AB2167 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3301 of, and to add Sections 3303.2 and 3309 to, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance.
Title
Unemployment insurance: paid family leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3303.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3309 | New Code | See Bill Text |