MA H3124 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4438

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the licensing of nonresidents enrolled as students. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the expiration of a nonresident enrolled student license

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-29HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4438
2016-02-23JointHearing scheduled for 02/29/2016 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H4438 (Replaced by) 2016-06-29 - Reported, in part, by H3043
H3289 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1675 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H281 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1676 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1677 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback