MA S1263 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2362
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to pedestrian stop data. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to pedestrian stop data
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2362 |
2016-01-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/04/2016 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2362 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1753 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
H1570 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
S1666 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1859 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1767 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S677 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2100
S1753 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
H1570 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
S1666 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1859 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1767 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S677 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2100
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1263 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1263.pdf |