MA S1242 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2362

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent illegal trafficking of firearms. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to preventing illegal trafficking of firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2362
2016-01-25JointHearing scheduled for 01/28/2016 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S2362 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1202 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1120 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2212
S1265 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1137 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2152
S1207 (Similar To) 2016-06-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S587 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1094 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback