MA S1272 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2362
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the lawful sale of handguns. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the Lawful Sale of Handguns
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Humason [R] | Rep. Geoff Diehl [R] | Rep. Dennis Rosa [D] | Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D] |
Rep. Paul Heroux [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2362 |
2016-01-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2016 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2362 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1273 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1189 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2213
S1660 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2016 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in 222
S1839 (Similar To) 2016-09-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 257 of the Acts of 2016
S1373 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1273 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1189 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2213
S1660 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2016 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in 222
S1839 (Similar To) 2016-09-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 257 of the Acts of 2016
S1373 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1272 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1272.pdf |