MA S1302 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2362

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide oversight of crime labs. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing oversight of crime labs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2362
2015-11-25JointHearing scheduled for 12/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S2362 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1175 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S635 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2381
S684 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S589 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S2504 (Similar To) 2016-11-07 - Placed on file
S1688 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1316 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1140 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1595 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1249 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1632 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1633 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback