MA S1595 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2290

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to support commercial fishing. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To support commercial fishing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2290
2015-07-07JointHearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1541 (Similar To) 2015-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S1974
S1440 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1606 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1456 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1451 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1568 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1937 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback