MA S1937 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to increase the exemption for residential property to 30 percent in the town of Nantucket. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the exemption for residential property to 30 percent in the town of Nantucket

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2016-03-28SenateBill reported favorably by committee as changed and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2016-02-18JointHearing scheduled for 02/23/2016 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2015-06-11HouseHouse concurred
2015-06-08SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S1936 (Similar To) 2016-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 179 of the Acts of 2016
S1935 (Similar To) 2016-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2016
S1606 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1456 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1451 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1568 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1595 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1439 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2158
S1414 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1548 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1541 (Similar To) 2015-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S1974
S1475 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback