MA S1568 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2290
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to strengthen working families by increasing tax exemptions and dependent care tax credits. Revenue.
Title
Strengthening working families by increasing tax exemptions and dependent care tax credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2290 |
2015-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1562 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4235
S1518 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1522 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1416 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1419 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
H1036 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S570
S1606 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1607 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2200 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - New draft substituted, see S2293
S1562 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4235
S1518 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1522 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1416 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1419 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
H1036 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S570
S1606 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1607 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2200 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - New draft substituted, see S2293
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1568 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1568.pdf |