MA S1562 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4235

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to create property tax credits for individuals with disabilities. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To create property tax credits for individuals with disabilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4235
2015-07-16JointHearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H4235 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1518 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1416 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S80 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S1579 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H136 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback