MA S1255 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2362
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce recidivism, curb unnecessary spending, and ensure appropriate use of segregation. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To reduce recidivism, curb unnecessary spending, and ensure appropriate use of segregation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2362 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2362 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1475 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4312
H1486 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S1824 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2266
S1771 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1665 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1323 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1704 (Similar To) 2015-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1308 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1235 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1241 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1242 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H1475 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4312
H1486 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S1824 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2266
S1771 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1665 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1323 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1704 (Similar To) 2015-10-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1308 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1235 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1241 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1242 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1255 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1255.pdf |