MA S1239 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2362
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent illegal trafficking and gun violence among youth in the Commonwealth. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Regarding the prevention of illegal trafficking and gun violence among youth in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2362 |
2016-01-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2016 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2362 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H3238 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3821
S251 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S206 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4135
S208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means
S284 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S820 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1157 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S778 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1210 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2411
S1124 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H3238 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3821
S251 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S206 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4135
S208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means
S284 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S820 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1157 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S778 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1210 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2411
S1124 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1239 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1239.pdf |