MA S1157 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2199

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent sudden cardiac arrest. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent sudden cardiac arrest

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2199
2015-05-27JointHearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S299 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1976
S242 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S1027 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S284 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S820 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1195 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S282 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2340
H223 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4183
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S251 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S99 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S333 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
S778 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1125 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1210 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2411
S1124 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
S1237 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback