MA S1896 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2387

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a distinctive registration plate supporting public schools. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a distinctive registration plate supporting public schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2387
2015-11-24JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2387 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1800 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied H2904
S1716 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S282 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2340
S263 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S318 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1976
S322 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2337
S1686 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S246 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
H3098 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback