MA S263 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2315
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote a coordinated public school focus on students with disabilities. Education.
Title
To promote a coordinated public school focus on students with disabilities
Sponsors
Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Daniel Ryan [D] | Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] | Sen. Linda Forry [D] |
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D] | Rep. Russell Holmes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2315 |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-05-19 | House | Hearing on 05/26/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 cancelled |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2315 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S282 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2340
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S318 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1976
S322 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2337
S2157 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - New draft substituted, see S2393
S282 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2340
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S318 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1976
S322 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2337
S2157 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - New draft substituted, see S2393
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S263 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S263.pdf |