MA S778 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2204

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to permit independent enforcement of restitution orders in criminal cases. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To permit independent enforcement of restitution orders in criminal cases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2204
2015-09-10JointHearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S716 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2383
S688 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied S664
S695 (Similar To) 2015-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3696
S1050 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S848 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S796 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S633 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1859 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S667 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback