MA S667 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2214

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the rights of faculty members at the University of Massachusetts. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the rights of faculty members at the University of Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2214
2015-05-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/17/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

S2214 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S679
S569 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S581 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1325 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S570 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1607 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1086 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4208

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback