MA S1325 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the University of Massachusetts police. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the University of Massachusetts police

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2016-01-28JointHearing scheduled for 02/04/2016 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1309 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1901 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1744 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1442 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2046
S1390 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S667 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S838 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S97 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S1349 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1280 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied S1311
H2306 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H3492
S1340 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1388 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S657 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2183
S828 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1292 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1269 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1363 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback