MA S581 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2356

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure access to medications. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure access to medications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2356
2015-10-05JointHearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S2356 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1508 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H2059 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
S1173 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1041 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1042 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S483 (Similar To) 2016-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2448
H2646 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1978 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1933 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2082 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback