MA S1042 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4272

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to responsible stewardship by drug manufacturers. Mental Health and Substance Abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to responsible stewardship by drug manufacturers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4272
2015-06-03JointHearing scheduled for 06/08/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse

Same As/Similar To

H4272 (Replaced by) 2016-05-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S408 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2052
S2052 (Similar To) 2016-01-21 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #215 [YEAS 25 - NAYS 11]
S2109 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2179 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H2009 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2036 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback