MA H2036 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4242

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to access to birth records of certain persons born out of wedlock. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to access to certain birth records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4242
2015-06-15JointHearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H4242 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H115 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback