CA AB2236 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Hearing: Jul 3 @ 9:30 am in State Capitol, Room 112
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Hearing: Jul 3 @ 9:30 am in State Capitol, Room 112
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Sections 42281.5, 42282, 42282.1, and 42283.6 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 42280, 42281, 42283, 42283.5, and 42284 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: reusable grocery bags: standards: plastic film prohibition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2236 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 7.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 19). |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42280 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42281 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42281.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42282 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42282.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42283 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42283.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42283.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42284 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |