CA SB37 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 4.6 (commencing with Section 19905) to Division 13 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to homelessness.
Title
Older Adults and Adults with Disabilities Housing Stability Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB37 Caballero et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3054.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3010.) (January 18). |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 875.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 452.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and HUMAN S. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 19905 | New Code | See Bill Text |