OR SB1571 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date, March 27, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date, March 27, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Act would require a disclosure of the use of AI or other similar technology in campaign ads. The Act would create a way to enforce the requirement and to impose a fine for violations. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). Requires a disclosure of the use of synthetic media in campaign communications. Provides for the enforcement of the requirement. Subjects a violation of the requirement to a civil penalty not to exceed $10,000. Exempts certain entities and content from the requirement. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the use of artificial intelligence in campaign communications; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Motion to Change Calendar (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Motion to Change Calendar (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Effective date, March 27, 2024. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 62, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Thatcher. |
2024-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 3--Reschke, Stout, Yunker; Absent, 1--Grayber; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Cramer, Owens. |
2024-03-05 | House | Second reading. |
2024-03-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2024-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Woods. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 7--Bonham, Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Taken from 02-22 Calendar and placed on 02-26 Calendar. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Findley, Linthicum, Woods. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Findley, Linthicum, Woods. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |