IL SB3301 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $ 10,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Public Health for local health protection grants for health protection programs. Effective July 1,2024.
Title
$IDPH-LOCAL HEALTH PROT GRANTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-08-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations - Health and Human Services |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |