CO SB065 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of mobile electronic devices when driving a motor vehicle, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Mobile Electronic Devices & Motor Vehicle Driving
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Joint - CC_SB24-065_2024A: Accept as the conference committee report the negotiated agreement. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - House: MISC Beyond Scope (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - House - House: MISC Request For Conference Cimmittee (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.040) (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-065 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 24-065 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-065, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-065, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - House: MISC Beyond Scope (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Not Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - House - House: MISC Request For Conference Cimmittee (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.040) (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-065 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 24-065 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-065, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-065, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2024-05-08 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2024-05-08 | First Conference Committee Result was to Corrected Report Amending Rerevised Bill | |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2024-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-05-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-09 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-03-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |