MI HB4332 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cities: home rule; penalties for certain blight offenders; increase. Amends sec. 4q of 1909 PA 279 (MCL 117.4q).
Title
Cities: home rule; penalties for certain blight offenders; increase. Amends sec. 4q of 1909 PA 279 (MCL 117.4q).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 307 (Y: 71 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 307 (Y: 71 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services |
2023-09-26 | House | Transmitted |
2023-09-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 307 Yeas 71 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-09-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-09-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-09-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-09-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-09-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-03-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/23/2023 |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2023-03-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-03-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Karen Whitsett |