MI SB0799 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Assigned Pa 0114'24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Assigned Pa 0114'24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: driver license; reference to driver responsibility fees; remove. Amends sec. 4 of 2008 PA 23 (MCL 28.304). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0706'24
Title
Traffic control: driver license; reference to driver responsibility fees; remove. Amends sec. 4 of 2008 PA 23 (MCL 28.304). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0706'24
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 188 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 92 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 92 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0114'24 |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 12:36 Pm |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 07/23/2024 10:36 Am |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/11/2024 01:54 Pm |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2024-06-20 | House | Returned To Senate |
2024-06-20 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2024-06-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 188 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2024-06-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-06-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-06-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure |
2024-04-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-04-10 | House | Received On 04/10/2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 92 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Veronica Klinefelt |
Same As/Similar To
SB0706 (Same As) 2024-07-30 - Assigned Pa 0113'24