NH HB1685 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-25 - Executive Session: 10/15/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-25 - Executive Session: 10/15/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining "homestead foods" as "artisan foods," creating an artisan food operations exemption, establishing artisan food products sales venues, and allowing the production and sale of artisan food products requiring refrigeration.
Title
Redefining "homestead foods" as "artisan foods," creating an artisan food operations exemption, establishing artisan food products sales venues, and allowing the production and sale of artisan food products requiring refrigeration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-25 | House | Executive Session: 10/15/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-09-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2024 12:45 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-08-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/04/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-06-04 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/10/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-02-22 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 11 |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 02/06/2024 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-01-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/31/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 29 |