MI SB0706 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Assigned Pa 0113'24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Traffic control: driver license; removal of failure to pay driver responsibility fees from centralized driving record; provide for. Amends secs. 204a, 304, 312f, 320e, 732a & 904 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.204a et seq.) & repeals secs. 732b & 732d of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.732b & 257.732d).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic control: driver license; removal of failure to pay driver responsibility fees from centralized driving record; provide for. Amends secs. 204a, 304, 312f, 320e, 732a & 904 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.204a et seq.) & repeals secs. 732b & 732d of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.732b & 257.732d).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 282 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 187 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 91 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-30SenateAssigned Pa 0113'24
2024-07-30SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 07/23/2024 12:34 Pm
2024-07-30SenateApproved By Governor 07/23/2024 10:34 Am
2024-07-30SenatePresented To Governor 07/11/2024 01:50 Pm
2024-06-26SenateOrdered Enrolled
2024-06-26SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2024-06-26SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 282 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2024-06-26SenateHouse Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
2024-06-20HouseReturned To Senate
2024-06-20HouseTitle Amended
2024-06-20HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 187 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2024-06-20HouseRead A Third Time
2024-06-18HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-06-18HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2024-06-18HouseRead A Second Time
2024-06-11HouseReferred To Second Reading
2024-06-11HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2024-04-10HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
2024-04-10HouseRead A First Time
2024-04-10HouseReceived On 04/10/2024
2024-04-10SenatePassed Roll Call # 91 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 1
2024-04-09SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2024-04-09SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2024-04-09SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2024-03-20SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2024-03-20SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2024-02-06SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2024-02-06SenateIntroduced By Senator Veronica Klinefelt

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2024-SB-0706
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2024-SIB-0706.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2024-SEBS-0706.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2024-SEBH-0706.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2024-SNB-0706.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/publicact/htm/2024-PA-0113.htm
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2024-SCVBS-0706-00B74.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0706-G.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0706-F.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0706-B.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0706-U.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0706-8351D163.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0706-D82DCD47.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0706-C393B36C.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2024-SJ-03-20-029.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2024-SJ-04-10-032.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-06-11-052.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-06-20-056.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2024-SJ-06-26-063.htm

Bill Comments

feedback