MO SB912 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Executive Session Scheduled H Rules - Legislative Oversight--(3:30 p.m. - HR 1)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 3:30 pm in House Hearing Room 1 (Executive Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Executive Session Scheduled H Rules - Legislative Oversight--(3:30 p.m. - HR 1)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 3:30 pm in House Hearing Room 1 (Executive Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to veterans
Title
Modifies provisions relating to veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Brown [R] | Rep. Dave Griffith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Executive Session Scheduled H Rules - Legislative Oversight--(3:30 p.m. - HR 1) |
2024-04-25 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2024-04-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Veterans |
2024-04-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Veterans |
2024-04-16 | House | Hearing Conducted H Veterans |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred H Veterans |
2024-03-28 | House | H Second Read |
2024-03-27 | House | H First Read |
2024-03-26 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Perfected |
2024-03-12 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(3361S06.01S) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2024-03-12 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(3361S06.02S) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Brown 26)--(3361S.06F) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee w/SCS |
2024-02-21 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee (3361S.02C) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |