MA H2330 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 78-10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing protections for health care employees who are victims of violence or assault and battery. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Requiring health care employers to develop and implement programs to prevent workplace violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1539 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2330 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2330.pdf |