NH HB1646 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to chartered public schools.
Title
Relative to chartered public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 2 |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 03/06/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/15/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 28 |