OH SB144 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Referred to committee: Health Provider Services
Pending: House Health Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-12 - Referred to committee: Health Provider Services
Pending: House Health Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4729.41 of the Revised Code regarding immunizations administered by pharmacists, pharmacy interns, and pharmacy technicians.
Title
Regards immunizations by pharmacists, pharmacy interns and techs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-12 | House | Referred to committee: Health Provider Services |
2023-12-07 | House | Introduced |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Passed |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Reported: Health |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Referred to committee: Health |
2023-08-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services : Health Care
House Health Provider Services Committee
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Senate Health Committee
House Health Provider Services Committee
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Senate Health Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 29 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |