MI SB0482 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-09 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-09 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health: medical waste; containment of medical waste; modify. Amends secs. 13809 & 13810 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.13809 & 333.13810).
Title
Health: medical waste; containment of medical waste; modify. Amends secs. 13809 & 13810 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.13809 & 333.13810).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 716 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-11-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-11-09 | House | Received On 11/09/2023 |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 716 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-11-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Kristen Mcdonald Rivet |