RI S2128 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- POSTING OF VETERANS' BENEFITS AND SERVICES - Requires employers in the state with more than 50 employees to display a poster containing basic information on veterans' benefits and services be created and distributed by the DLT in consultation with the office of veterans services.
Title
Requires employers in the state with more than 50 employees to display a poster containing basic information on veterans' benefits and services be created and distributed by the DLT in consultation with the office of veterans services.
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. David Tikoian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2128.pdf |