MA H2009 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4635

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to providing access to patient protection services for all residents. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing access to patient protection services for all Massachusetts residents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-26HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4635
2016-03-16SenateSenate concurred
2016-03-14HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2015-10-13JointHearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H4635 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1804 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1805 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H3038 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
H526 (Similar To) 2016-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4535
H2010 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback