MA S820 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2204

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent intimidation in all courts of the Commonwealth. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent intimidation in all courts of the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2204
2015-07-14JointHearing rescheduled to 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-07-01JointHearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S2204 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S812
S778 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S284 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1147 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2147
S1210 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2411
S1157 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
H223 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4183
S1190 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1124 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
S1237 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S871 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback