MA S1210 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2411

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to enhance computerized physician order entry (CPOE) to ensure access to medically necessary services. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To enhance computerized physician order entry (CPOE) to ensure access to medically necessary services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-08SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2411
2016-06-06SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2015-11-09JointHearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2411 (Replaced by) 2016-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S584 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1778 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1849 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1323 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S176 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Accompanied H262
S1047 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S766 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1246 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1576 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1575 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S808 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback