MA S1190 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2199
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to protecting hospital and community health center patients. Public Health.
Title
To prevent unscrupulous medical debt recovery practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2199 |
2015-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S1124 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
S1047 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S878 (Similar To) 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2369
S284 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S820 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1157 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S778 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1210 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2411
S1237 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1124 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
S1047 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S878 (Similar To) 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2369
S284 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S820 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1157 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S778 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1210 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2411
S1237 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1190 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1190.pdf |