MA S1420 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to retirement board membership. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement board membership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2314 |
2016-01-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2016 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2314 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1276 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H3678 (Similar To) 2016-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4277
S1308 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H2088 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2306 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H3492
S1276 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H3678 (Similar To) 2016-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4277
S1308 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H2088 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2306 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Accompanied H3492
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1420 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1420.pdf |