MA H1050 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4228
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the expansion of the valedictorian tuition waiver program in the public system of higher education. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to the expansion of the valedictorian tuition waiver program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4228 |
2015-09-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4228 (Replaced by) 2016-04-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1400 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1396 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H4753 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
H1400 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1396 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H4753 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1050 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1050.pdf |