MI HB5694 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
Pending: Senate Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
Pending: Senate Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: unfair trade practices; unfair trade practices in the insurance industry; revise. Amends sec. 2025 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.2025) & repeals secs. 2024a & 2024b of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.2024a & 500.2024b).
Title
Insurance: unfair trade practices; unfair trade practices in the insurance industry; revise. Amends sec. 2025 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.2025) & repeals secs. 2024a & 2024b of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.2024a & 500.2024b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 258 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection |
2024-06-26 | House | Transmitted |
2024-06-26 | House | Title Amended |
2024-06-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 258 Yeas 104 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-26 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2024-06-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2024-06-26 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-05-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-05-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2024-05-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/30/2024 |
2024-04-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services |
2024-04-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-04-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Brenda Carter |