CO HB1326 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning continuation under the sunset law of the licensing of certain games of chance including bingo, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Bingo-Raffle Licensing Sunset Review
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1326 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1326, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment B). (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1326, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1326, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1326, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1326, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1326 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1326, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment B). (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1326, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1326, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1326, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment I). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1326, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-10 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |