CA SB393 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 529.2 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil actions: housing development projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB393 Glazer et al (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2024-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2024-06-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2024-06-03AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2023-07-06AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2023-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2023-05-26AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
2023-05-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-15SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 1077.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-04SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1011.) (May 2).
2023-04-18SenateSet for hearing May 2.
2023-04-14SenateApril 18 hearing postponed by committee.
2023-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2023-03-21SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-03-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 353.) (March 15).
2023-02-27SenateSet for hearing March 15.
2023-02-22SenateReferred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
2023-02-10SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2023-02-09SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure529.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB393
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB393#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB393#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB393#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB393#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB393#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB393#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB393#93AMD
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB393

Bill Comments

feedback