IL HB5436 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Permits the operation of an all-terrain vehicle that meets certain criteria on any street, roadway, or highway in the State, unless the highway is an interstate system, is near a grade-separated portion of the highway, is within a municipality, or has a posted speed limit higher than 45 miles per hour. Provides that an all-terrain vehicle must be registered with the Secretary of State if the all-terrain vehicle is operated on roads within the State. Provides for the distribution of registration fees. Outlines the vehicle equipment requirements for the operation of an all-terrain vehicle on a roadway. Establishes that a township, county, or other unit of local government may authorize, by ordinance or resolution, the operation of all-terrain vehicles on roadways under its jurisdiction if the unit of local government determines that the public safety will not be jeopardized. Requires a non-highway vehicle that is manufactured not to exceed 40 miles per hour to have a slow moving emblem on the rear of the non-highway vehicle. Provides that the Department of Transportation may authorize the operation of all-terrain vehicles on the roadways under its jurisdiction if the Department determines that the public safety will not be jeopardized. Allows a unit of local government or the Department to restrict the types of all-terrain vehicles that are authorized to be used on its streets. Provides that a unit of local government that permits the use of an all-terrain vehicle on its roadways shall not be deemed liable for crashes involving the use of an all-terrain vehicle on its roadways. Makes other changes.
Title
FREEDOM TO RIDE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-1426.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-1426.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-412 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-805.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |