CA AB1186 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-06 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Becker.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-06 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Becker.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13963 and 77203 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 2085.5, 2085.6, and 2085.7 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 202, 653.5, 654.3, 656, 729, 729.1, 730, 730.6, 730.7, 742.16, 742.20, 781, 782, 794, and 1752.81 of, to repeal Sections 729.5, 742.14, 742.18, 1752.82, and 1766.1 of, and to repeal and add Section 730.8 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: restitution.
Sponsors
Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1186 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1186 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Becker. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 1806.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |